THE POUND ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pound Arts Trust Limited is responsible for running The Pound arts centre, the arts hub for north Wiltshire; Corsham Festivals and Rural Arts Wiltshire & Rural Arts South Gloucestershire, the rural touring scheme. Through a programme of performances, workshops, exhibitions & talks, The Pound Arts Trust aims to create both cultural & educational opportunities for people of all ages & abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,300 from 4 government contract(s) and £64,298 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 March 2004: Standard registration
- POSTHORN ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam James Walton | Chair | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Parker | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Knight | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Marcia Angella Johnson | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Henry Francis Shepherd | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Robertson | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Victoria Catterall | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Crarer | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Dawes | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rebecca Roynon | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £718.17k | £374.78k | £371.79k | £448.77k | £467.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £446.13k | £303.93k | £450.94k | £534.88k | £538.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £11.00k | £18.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | £428.63k | £331.17k | £135.72k | £135.72k | £64.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £57.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £386.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £103 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £446.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 6 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 16 MARCH 2004 AND 9 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF ARTISTIC PRODUCTIONS AND ACTIVITIES TO BE AVAILABLE FOR PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF AGE, GENDER, RACE, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL BACKGROUND. (B) THE PROMOTION OF ARTISTIC EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF CONCERTS, RECITALS, EXHIBITIONS, FESTIVALS (SPECIFICALLY CORSHAM FESTIVAL), DRAMATIC PRODUCTIONS, FILM, RURAL TOURING AND OTHER ARTISTIC MEDIA. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE: (C) ORGANISATION OF PARTICIPATORY ARTS WORKSHOPS ACROSS A RANGE OF ARTFORMS WITH ACCESS TO PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, BACKGROUNDS AND ABILITIES. (D) PROMOTION AND/OR ORGANISATION OF OTHER ARTISTIC EVENTS CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WEST REGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE POUND ARTS CENTRE
POUND PILL
CORSHAM
SN13 9HX
- Phone:
- 01249712618
- Email:
- info@poundarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window