Financial history HIGHLANDS VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1101994
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 29/01/2008
Total gross income £22.95k £24.43k £20.65k £23.74k £11.15k
Total expenditure £10.44k £22.01k £19.36k £21.43k £8.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A