BARTON-LE-WILLOWS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1102214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists primarily to maintain a Village Hall for the recreational use of the villagers of Barton Hill, Barton-Le-Willows, Harton, Bossall, Howsham and Crambe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £1,857
Total expenditure: £1,952

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Hall Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Joanna Danischewsky Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Mark Mirfin Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
ANNE ROEBUCK Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
SIR FREDERIC STRICKLAND-CONSTABLE Trustee
WHITBY AREA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
PAUL ROEBUCK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.98k £6.33k £1.21k £1.63k £1.86k
Total expenditure £2.66k £2.55k £2.29k £2.22k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 31 October 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 17 December 2022 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Village Hall
Barton Le Willows
YORK
YO60 7PD
Phone:
01653 618683
Website:

bartonlewillowsvillagehall.weebly.com