Financial history RE-CREATE- CARDIFF AND VALE PLAY SERVICES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.29k £68.84k £60.39k £70.16k £57.16k
Total expenditure £41.79k £45.09k £48.31k £42.97k £53.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.03k N/A N/A N/A