KERALA CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OLYMPIC MELA 2012 JOINT PROJECT WITH MALAYALEE ASSOCIATION OF THE UK AND SREE NARAYANA GURU MISSION OF THE UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EARNEST PETER | Chair | 09 July 2017 |
|
|||||
DAMIEN ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr ELSIE LIZY DAMIEN | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER FERNANDEZ | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUNIL PEREIRA | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
HERMIT SHAJAN JOSEPH | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.48k | £10.68k | £6.43k | £1.39k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £8.79k | £4.73k | £2.17k | £4.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2000 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF KERALA CATHOLICS SETTLED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE 3. TO ADVANCE RELIGION
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 CARLYLE ROAD
LONDON
E12 6BN
- Phone:
- 07533374990
- Email:
- kcauk.org@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window