HALTWHISTLE LITTLE STAR PR- SCHOOL

Charity number: 1100529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity operates a Day Nursery for children in Haltwhistle and the surrounding area from birth to 4 years of age. The Charity also runs Playgroup sessions and a before and after school club.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £121,712
Total expenditure: £110,488

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HALTWHISTLE LITTLE STAR (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Atkinson Chair
YOUNG AND SWEET
Received: On time
HAZEL FLETCHER Trustee
None on record
LYDIA DENISE ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £161.61k £133.13k £115.34k £93.74k £121.71k
Total expenditure £158.42k £148.93k £125.06k £97.44k £110.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOODHEAD LANE
HALTWHISTLE
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE49 9DP
Phone:
01434322233