THE MAXIMUM LIFE YOUTH PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Project provides activities and events for children and young people in the local area, which is one of the most deprived in the country. Our mission statements is to improve the quality of life for young people by providing opportunity for social, physical, mental and spiritual development, and so empowering them to mature as responsible and caring members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £30,405 from 1 government contract(s) and £17,049 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 14 January 2004: Standard registration
- MAXLIFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Pank | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wardale | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Van Den Born | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mike McDermott | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Spooner | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||
JAYNE GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD AXFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.13k | £69.45k | £91.55k | £86.58k | £88.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.26k | £69.63k | £64.46k | £89.76k | £92.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £14.78k | £54.15k | £22.42k | £30.41k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.74k | £6.43k | £6.87k | £17.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28 DEC 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) KINGSTON UPON HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSTON WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH
882 HOLDERNESS ROAD
HULL
HU9 3LP
- Phone:
- 07960551572
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window