HOUSE PROJECT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Resource Centre for local residents offering activities and courses, social groups and opportunities to volunteer. The Project organizes events in the community such as Tea Dances, and gives support to local nursery groups, nursing homes and other organisations. All services are provided free.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 October 2003: Standard registration
- THE HOUSE PROJECT (Working name)
- PEACEHAVEN AND TELSCOMBE HOUSE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROLD DE SOUZA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Faye Mason | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maxwell Aneuirn Rosser | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reginald George Farmiloe | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lavinia Ann Crawley | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
KARITA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Violet Irene Simpson | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Farmiloe | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY FRANCES PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY CAMERON DE SOUZA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.09k | £59.69k | £191.25k | £209.38k | £185.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.95k | £22.59k | £51.92k | £94.00k | £140.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2024 | 718 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 7 JULY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES OF EAST SALTDEAN, TELSCOMBE CLIFFS, PEACEHAVEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSE BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, TO FACILITATE AND PROMOTE DIRECT PARTICIPATION BY LOCAL PEOPLE IN THE RUNNING AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE PROJECT BY SELF-HELP ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITIES OF EAST SALTDEAN, TELSCOMBE CLIFFS, PEACEHAVEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Seaview Road
Papillon
Peacehaven
BN10 8PX
- Phone:
- 01273589647
- Email:
- jean.farmiloe@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window