LEGACY XS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for recreation, sport, other leisure-time activities and advancement of education for young people. The facilities are mainly provided at the Legacy XS Community Youth Centre and Skatepark, Richmond Park, Richmond Avenue, Benfleet, Essex, SS7 5HE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 23 October 2003: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1102987 THE LEGACY TRUST (BENFLEET)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Hillman | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rose | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Hillman | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUZANNE MARSHAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW ALAN ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.14k | £40.01k | £48.47k | £13.74k | £13.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.47k | £56.47k | £59.33k | £39.37k | £53.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £32.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, SPORT AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH INFIRMITY DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN BENFLEET AND ENVIRONS IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID LOCATION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BENFLEET AND ENVIRONS IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 LAMBETH ROAD
BENFLEET
SS7 4BN
- Phone:
- 07866493886
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window