THE GOOD CAUSES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities include helping deserving students having low family income, helping schools working in low income areas, helping widows/orphans, sick and disabled and needy/handicapped people through monetary grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 13 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M. H. KAZMI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr HAIDER ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAUSHIN KAZIMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHERMEEN KAZMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGAR KAZMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.64k | £10.78k | £10.35k | £6.28k | £8.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £9.03k | £11.95k | £7.87k | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, ILL AND DISABLED PEOPLE, AND FOR THE CARE AND ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE THIRD WORLD (PARTICULARLY FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT).
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE THIRD WORLD (PARTICULARLY FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT)
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LAURINO PLACE
BUSHEY
WD23 1QP
- Phone:
- 02084204957
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window