ULVERSTON INSHORE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an effective rescue service for any human animal or boat in peril from the sea or Sands of Morecambe Bay and beyond as required. Also to provide services for search and sand rescue etc. To educate the public to the dangers of Morecambe Bay.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 January 2004: Standard registration
- 20 August 2024: Funds received from 1178921 ULVERSTON CANAL REGENERATION GROUP
- ULVERSTON INSHORE RESCUE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley-Anne Wilson | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Owen Collar | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Jackie Drake | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hornby | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN HUTT | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA PROSSER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.99k | £14.44k | £30.66k | £14.95k | £59.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.28k | £35.71k | £56.45k | £30.06k | £34.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £500 | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 20 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE SAFETY OF AND PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN EFFECTIVE RESCUE SERVICE FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF ANY HUMAN BEING, ANIMAL OR BOAT OF ANY NATURE IN PERIL FROM THE SEA IN THE AREA OF THE ESTUARY OF THE RIVER LEVEN / ULVERSTON CHANNEL / SOUTH CHANNEL IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 BIRKETT DRIVE
ULVERSTON
LA12 9LN
- Phone:
- 01229586974
- Email:
- jwprosser@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window