Trustees ULVERSTON INSHORE RESCUE

Charity number: 1101567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirley-Anne Wilson Trustee 12 February 2025
ULVERSTON, FORD PARK COMMUNITY GROUP
Received: On time
Owen Collar Trustee 19 July 2023
PENNINGTON NURSERY
Received: 8 days late
Jackie Drake Trustee 06 April 2023
None on record
John Hornby Trustee 22 January 2022
None on record
IAN HUTT Trustee 17 September 2011
BARROW MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time
PATRICIA PROSSER Trustee
None on record