ST PAUL'S (KNIGHTSBRIDGE) FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Choir shall be to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science or music in all its aspects by the presentation of public concerts; and for the general purposes of such charitable bodies or for such other purposes as shall be exclusively charitable as the Committee may from time to time decide [Constitution 2 Objects].
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN LUMSDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter John Bellett Dixon | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marina Collett | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Streatfeild | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Egyptien-Rezajooi | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Helen Ridler | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAWN VANESSA CARRITT | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carol Stewart | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA LASCELLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.16k | £2.20k | £14.90k | £25.85k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £1.30k | £18.37k | £20.53k | £23.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1954 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Kensington Heights
91-95 Campden Hill Road
LONDON
W8 7BD
- Phone:
- 02072293869
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window