RELATE BROMLEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relate provides the following services: adult relationship counselling for couples and individuals; psychosexual therapy; family counselling; counselling for children and young people aged 5 to 18 years. Relate Bromley trades as Relate London South East. We cover eight London boroughs and our main centres are in Bromley, Croydon, Wimbledon and London Bridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Merton
- Southwark
- Sutton
Governance
- 14 November 2003: Standard registration
- 13 May 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 May 2021: Funds transferred to 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £429.66k | £511.49k | £625.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £443.43k | £447.79k | £636.38k | £101.69k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.70k | £0 | £2.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | £13.00k | £151.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.31k | £200 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £74.26k | £62.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £408.79k | £563.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £230 | £126 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £26.91k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £447.79k | £587.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £49.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.32k | £4.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 15 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE; 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH; 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR - 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window