Financial history KIRSTY BROWN FUND

Charity number: 1101189
Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £202 £202 £243 £20.24k £3
Total expenditure £2.10k £100 £110 £110 £747
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A