KIRSTY BROWN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scientific Research by way of the making of grants to qualified individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
- Antarctica
Governance
- 15 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAMILLA DAWN MCGRATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUNCAN GRANT BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS D ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202 | £202 | £243 | £20.24k | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £100 | £110 | £110 | £747 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROMOTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, IN THE SHORT TERM, INTO THE LEOPARD SEAL OR SEA LEOPARD (HYDRURGA LEPTONYX); (B) ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING RESEARCH, IN THE LONGER TERM, INTO SUCH GEOLOGICAL SUBJECTS AS AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME; AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWAINS
MARLPOST ROAD
SOUTHWATER
HORSHAM
RH13 9BY
- Phone:
- 01403730831
- Email:
- david.g.hudson1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window