Financial history ALLIANCE FRANCAISE DE MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1100092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £83.18k £65.15k £70.03k £67.83k £84.49k
Total expenditure £66.01k £64.28k £62.90k £68.97k £79.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.22k N/A N/A