Trustees ALLIANCE FRANCAISE DE MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1100092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lara Georgina Mynors Chair 08 February 2018
None on record
Lindiwe Sandra Moyo Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Richard Alastair Whitehead Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Marina Fernande Lucile Trestchenkoff Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Kellyann Bridget Lucia Ripnar Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Richard John Forman Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
Kathleen Keillor Trustee 20 March 2015
CAROLINE HASLETT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
ANTHONY ROCKLEIGH KAYE Trustee
None on record