CUDDINGTON AND SANDIWAY PARISH PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage Playing Fields in Cuddington & Sandiway. Run the Village Hall on the Norley Road Playing Field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,602 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 25 November 2003: Standard registration
- C&SPPFA LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Catherall | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Cowen | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Mackie Barr | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.12k | £52.63k | £48.79k | £58.08k | £62.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.71k | £50.90k | £54.81k | £52.41k | £65.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.00k | £18.00k | £18.58k | £20.00k | £12.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 6 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FORMS OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE, INCLUDING THE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS FOR THE CUDDINGTON CIVIL PARISH ON THE PARISH PLAYING FIELDS NORLEY ROAD CUDDINGTON AND/OR ANY OTHER AREAS IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF CUDDINGTON
Area of benefit
PARISH PLAYING FIRLDS NORLEY ROAD, CUDDINGTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mount
Cuddington Lane
NORTHWICH
Cheshire
CW8 2SZ
- Phone:
- 01606889698
- Email:
- mary9tavener@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window