STORYBOOK DADS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Storybook Dads operates in approx 100 prisons nationwide and enables imprisoned parents to send audio and video of themselves reading a story to their children. These stories are edited and enhanced using digital software to make a unique and special gift for each child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 December 2003: Standard registration
- Storybook Dad (Working name)
- STORYBOOK FAMILIES (Working name)
- STORYBOOK MUMS (Working name)
- STORYBOOK DAD (Previous name)
- STORYBOOK FAMILIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Hearl | Chair | 13 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Ken Martin | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Butler | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary FRANK Cllr | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.48k | £219.40k | £184.39k | £320.71k | £223.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.63k | £178.51k | £181.72k | £213.54k | £242.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/08/2003 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIBERTY AND WHO ARE DETAINED PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PRISONS IN THE UK AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDINGS OF STORIES FOR THEIR CHILDREN IN AN EFFORT TO MAINTAIN AND STRENGTHEN FAMILY LINKS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE DETAINED IN PRISONS IN THE UK AND IRELAND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN AUDIO AND VIDEO PRODUCTION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CHANCES OF REHABILITATION INTO THE COMMUNITY. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF THOSE RELEASED FROM UK PRISONS BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR FURTHER TRAINING IN AUDIO AND VIDEO PRODUCTION THROUGH PAID EMPLOYMENT OR VOLUNTEERING WITH STORYBOOK DADS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Storybook Dads
18 Belle Vue Road
Saltash
Cornwall
PL12 6ES
- Phone:
- 0300 365 3237
- Email:
- info@storybookdads.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window