BEESTON MUSLIM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education support Prayers Provision Youth Forum Health Advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

39 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 04 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANSOOR AHMED | Chair | 12 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
Hashim Ahmed | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shazad Ahmed | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Tahir | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adnan Hussain | Trustee | 13 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mazhar Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ali Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zahir Ul Din | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Zaman | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nisar Hussain | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Zaheem | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Feroz Din | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sagir Khan | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kaleem Ashraf | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Kataria | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Interkhab Ahmed Din | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Maqsood Ahmed | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saleem | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHABIR ZAMAN | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Shafiq Ahmed | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Shafique Fazal | Trustee | 01 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MEHARBAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHULAM MAYAUD DIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAMID MUMTAZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BASHIR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED YASIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED UMAR FAROOQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMED YAKUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ZAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHABBIR KATARIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAZA AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SHAFIQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KANEEZ AKBAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHERAZ MUMTAZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHAZANFAR AYUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RIZWAN AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYOUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AKRAM MALIK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.40k | £61.41k | £76.42k | £65.28k | £95.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.48k | £43.18k | £68.40k | £61.65k | £90.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.64k | £5.03k | £3.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEESTON, NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR THE MUSLIM RELIGION, ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
BEESTON, NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A EVELYN STREET
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2EU
- Phone:
- 0115 9346370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window