CHADDESLEY CORBETT PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chaddesley Corbett PTA aims to support the education of the children at the Chaddesley Corbett Endowed Primary School by donating towards extra cirricular trips and purchasing equipment to improve the education of the children at our school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Roberts | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
HELEN STOCKDALE | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Kay Walker | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £3.14k | £3.88k | £5.27k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £6.46k | £2.02k | £1.68k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 July 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF CHADDESLEY CORBETT ENDOWED FIRST SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHADDESLEY CORBETT ENDOWED PRIMARY
SCHOOL
NETHERCROFT MEADOW
LOWER CHADDESLEY
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 4QN
- Phone:
- CHADDESLEYCORBETTPRIMARYPTFA@GMAIL.COM
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
ccschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window