MID-STAFFORDSHIRE YOUTH NET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
lunchtime and after school clubs, RE lessons, prayer spaces in local schools, Prince's Trust groups, town wide Christian youth work & events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £6,863 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 October 2003: Standard registration
- 05 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1199420 THE YOUTH NET
- MID-STAFFS YOUTH NET (Working name)
- MID-STAFFS YOUTH.NET (Working name)
- MSYN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.13k | £142.77k | £154.78k | £131.21k | £47.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.55k | £138.55k | £144.06k | £139.14k | £47.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.55k | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.20k | N/A | £47.57k | £22.15k | £6.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN MID-STAFFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE SAID LOCALITY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
MID-STAFFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window