Financial history CLASSWORKS THEATRE

Charity number: 1100612
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £23.92k £24.99k £18.44k £643 £2.35k
Total expenditure £25.20k £16.27k £20.23k £8.56k £8.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A