OPEN SOCIETY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education Advancement of good citizenship and civil society Advancement of human rights Promotion of conflict resolution and reconciliation Promotion of equality and diversity Relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, disability or other disadvantage Prevention and relief of poverty Advancement of health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income:
£15,097,093
Donations and legacies | £15.10m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £301 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£16,806,888
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £16.81m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.81m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Burma
- Cambodia
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Italy
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Liberia
- Macedonia
- Mali
- Moldova
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Niger
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Romania
- Serbia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tajikistan
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uzbekistan
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 23 July 2004: Standard registration
- 04 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- IUF LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.29m | £14.35m | £13.23m | £17.07m | £15.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50m | £14.63m | £13.14m | £17.50m | £16.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.29m | £14.35m | £13.23m | £0 | £15.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £17.07m | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £262 | £2.27k | £733 | £301 | |
|
Income - Other | £232 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.45m | £14.60m | £13.12m | £17.50m | £16.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.63k | £34.85k | £26.87k | £0 | £57.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £1.07m | £0 | £95.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.37m | £2.26m | £1.94m | £1.75m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.06m | £2.81m | £2.69m | £2.93m | £19.97k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.05m | £2.98m | £2.45m | £2.97m | £19.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 20 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 20 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 21 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 21 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 09 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 15 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND FUNDING TO STUDENTS, SCHOLARS, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF DIFFERENT COUNTRIES TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS AND INSTITUTIONS TO ATTEND AND DELIVER COURSES OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH SEMINARS AND TO PROMOTE ACADEMIC EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS BY TEACHING OR BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON HUMAN RIGHTS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN JOURNALISM AND REPORTING IN OTHER MEDIA; 4.1.4 THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE QUALITY AND EQUITY OF, AND ACCESS TO, EDUCATIONAL PROVISION. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIL SOCIETY INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.2.1 SUPPORTING ACTION TO PROMOTE GOOD GOVERNANCE AND DEMOCRACY BY ENCOURAGING, AMONG OTHER THINGS, PARTICIPATION IN LEGALLY RECOGNIZED DEMOCRATIC PROCESSES; 4.2.2 SUPPORTING CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS THE TERM “CIVIL SOCIETY” SHALL NOT INCLUDE POLITICAL PARTIES, AND OTHER BODIES WHOSE PURPOSE IS PRIMARILY POLITICAL AS THIS TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH CHARITY LAW. 4.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UN CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.3.1 MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 4.3.2 RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 4.3.3 PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY; 4.3.4 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS. 4.4 THE PROMOTION OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION. 4.5 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF ANY FORM OF DISCRIMINATION INCLUDING DISCRIMINATION AGAINST ROMA, ON GROUNDS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE AND RELIGION. 4.6 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4.7 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY. 4.8 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH. 4.9 THE PROMOTION OF THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LAW, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OTHER OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY. 4.10 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE, ASIA, AFRICA AND LATIN AMERICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window