Governing document OPEN SOCIETY FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND FUNDING TO STUDENTS, SCHOLARS, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF DIFFERENT COUNTRIES TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS AND INSTITUTIONS TO ATTEND AND DELIVER COURSES OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH SEMINARS AND TO PROMOTE ACADEMIC EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS BY TEACHING OR BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON HUMAN RIGHTS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN JOURNALISM AND REPORTING IN OTHER MEDIA; 4.1.4 THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE QUALITY AND EQUITY OF, AND ACCESS TO, EDUCATIONAL PROVISION. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIL SOCIETY INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.2.1 SUPPORTING ACTION TO PROMOTE GOOD GOVERNANCE AND DEMOCRACY BY ENCOURAGING, AMONG OTHER THINGS, PARTICIPATION IN LEGALLY RECOGNIZED DEMOCRATIC PROCESSES; 4.2.2 SUPPORTING CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS THE TERM “CIVIL SOCIETY” SHALL NOT INCLUDE POLITICAL PARTIES, AND OTHER BODIES WHOSE PURPOSE IS PRIMARILY POLITICAL AS THIS TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH CHARITY LAW. 4.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UN CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 4.3.1 MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 4.3.2 RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 4.3.3 PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY; 4.3.4 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS. 4.4 THE PROMOTION OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION. 4.5 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF ANY FORM OF DISCRIMINATION INCLUDING DISCRIMINATION AGAINST ROMA, ON GROUNDS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE AND RELIGION. 4.6 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4.7 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY. 4.8 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH. 4.9 THE PROMOTION OF THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LAW, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OTHER OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY. 4.10 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE, ASIA, AFRICA AND LATIN AMERICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.