Accounts and annual returns GAUDIYA MISSION UK

Charity number: 1102958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2023 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2023 352 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2023 717 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2023 717 days late Download Open in new window