GAUDIYA MISSION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a variety of social, leisure and recreatioinal activities. Running activities that promotes better community cohesion and racial and religious integration Providing Art/culture/heritage, Promoting better education to people of all races, walks of life, disability etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
Governance
- 31 March 2004: Standard registration
- GM (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHAKTI SUNDAR SANYASI MAHARAJ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bhakti Parmod Puri | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jayanta Kumar Saha | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajendra Gupta | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAKSHMIPATI DAS BRAHMACHARY | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sukeshlata Barrotte | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAYAL THAKUR DAS BRAHMACHARY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.99k | £91.46k | £122.32k | £483.40k | £175.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.68k | £34.27k | £47.24k | £107.06k | £119.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2024
(These accounts |
06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2023 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
18 October 2023 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2023 | 717 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2023 | 717 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 MARCH 2004, AND AMENDED 15 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF HINDU VAISNAVA FAITH (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST BENGALI, INDIAN AND DEVOTEES FROM ANY OTHER COMMUNITIES (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LITERACY, NUMERACY, BENGALI LANGUAGE AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT CLASSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 CRANHURST ROAD
LONDON
NW2 4LJ
- Phone:
- 02084522733
- Email:
- ddasbrahmachary@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
ukgaudiyamission.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window