IZAAK WALTON COTTAGE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Updating exhibits in the Izaak Walton Cottage Museum. Teaching young people how to fish. Teaching about the environment. Putting on fairs at the Cottage Near Stone, Staffordshire, and attending other fairs to make people aware of Izaak Walton contribution the world of literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 December 2003: Standard registration
- 08 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.77k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £800 | £700 | £700 | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 08 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 18 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 February 2016 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 6TH OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF IZAAK WALTON COTTAGE, TOGETHER WITH IS TWO PIECES OF ADJACENT LAND, IN THE VILLAGE OF SHALLOWFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE (A) AS AN OBJECT OF HISTORICAL INTEREST TO THE PUBLIC (B) AS AN ENCOURAGEMENT AND MEANS OF INSTRUCTION IN THE STUDY OF THOSE BRANCHES OF NATURAL HISTORY WHICH DEAL WITH THE HABITS OF FISH, AND THE CULTURE OF ANGLING (C) AS A MEANS OF PROMOTING THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE BEST ENGLISH WRITERS, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF THE AGE IN WHICH IZAAK WALTON LIVED.
Area of benefit
IN THE VILLAGE OF SHALLOWFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window