EAST AND WEST AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The protection and preservation of health of families,young people and children in the area of benefit, advancement of education and provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of families, young people and children in the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
- India
Governance
- 24 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARBANS LAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dalton SAA | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Francis Shamuyarira | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gurpreet KAUR | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR PAUL BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.03k | £48.76k | £35.12k | £53.38k | £42.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.75k | £42.59k | £41.72k | £52.71k | £44.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF FAMILIES, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF EXCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE FAMILIES, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN WHO ARE FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, INDIA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF FAMILIES, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN WHO ARE FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR FAMILIES, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN WHO ARE FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON, UK AND INDIA AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST & WEST AID
16 SUNBEAM STUDIOS
SUNBEAM STREET
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 4PF
- Phone:
- 07966673960
- Email:
- eastwestaid@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window