Financial history BERNIE GRANT CENTRE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1102263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £747.46k £1.23m £984.78k £848.81k £1.15m
Total expenditure £1.12m £899.48k £1.33m £1.30m £1.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £854.41k £401.91k £253.92k £518.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £35.18k £1.25k £0 £453.86k £647.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £378.60k
Income - Charitable activities £675.80k £1.19m £948.49k £356.77k £84.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.48k £35.88k £36.29k £38.17k £37.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £899.48k £1.33m £1.30m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.73k £25.15k £10.28k £19.15k £25.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0