FRISHTA SCHOOL & ORPHANAGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving Indian abandoned and disadvantaged children a home, an education, a hope and a future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 28 October 2003: Standard registration
- 02 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1120888 MORNING STAR MINISTRIES
- FRISHTA (Working name)
- FRISHTA CHILDREN'S HOME (Working name)
- FRISHTA CHILDREN'S HOME INDIA (Working name)
- FRISHTA CHILDREN'S VILLAGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.01k | £82.38k | £126.99k | £79.03k | £42.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.68k | £62.20k | £116.07k | £8.15k | £35.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 11 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 11 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 11 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 13 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOOLS, HOSTEL/ORPHANAGES IN THE CHANDIGARH AREA OF THE PUNJAB, NORTHERN INDIA FOR THE GLORY OF JESUS CHRIST. THIS OBJECT IS UNDERSTOOD TO INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING AMONG ITS ACTIVITIES: THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION TO POOR AND UNDER PRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN CHANDIGARH AREA, N INDIA. DOING DEEDS OF MERCY FOR THE GENERAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITIES OF CHANDIGARH. CONDUCTING YOUTH PROGRAMS FOR CHURCH MEMBERS AND OF THE COMMUNITIES OF CHANDIGARH. SEEKING THE WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CHANDIGARH AREA.
Area of benefit
CHANDIGARH AREA OF THE PUNJAB, NORTHERN INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window