Accounts and annual returns ROBERT BOWMAN GALLERY TRUST

Charity number: 1101132
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 April 2010 73 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 April 2008 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 February 2007 28 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 06 March 2006 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 06 March 2006 34 days late