LOWESTOFT SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide manual and powered wheel-chairs and powered scooters for loan to people with impaired mobility enabling them to Socialise, Shop and visit local amenities, thereby promoting the Welfare and Independence of those people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ANN OLDHAM | Chair |
|
||||||
Theresa Gandy Tess | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rachael Chapman | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Webber | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Perring | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HILDA PERRING | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Abdullah | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
LES OLDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.13k | £46.30k | £33.88k | £41.97k | £62.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.45k | £48.60k | £51.21k | £47.79k | £46.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.08k | £4.11k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2003. as amended on 20 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND INDEPENDENCE OF PERSONS WITH IMPAIRED MOBILITY IN THE TOWN OF LOWESTOFT AND IN THE WAVENEY DISTRICT BY: A) PROMOTING EASE OF ACCESS TO LOCAL FACILITIES THROUGH PROVISION OF DIRECT SERVICES AND THROUGH WORKING WITH OTHER GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS TO IMPROVE TO LOCAL, BUILT AND ATTITUDINAL ENVIRONMENT. B) PROVIDING FOR HIRE OR LOAN ELECTRIC AND MANUAL WHEELCHAIRS AND SCOOTERS TO ENABLE ACCESS TO THE SHOPS, BUSINESSES AND PLACES OF INTEREST IN LOWESTOFT AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF LOWESTOFT AND IN THE WAVENEY DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWESTOFT SHOPMOBILITY
15 STATION SQUARE
LOWESTOFT
NR32 1BA
- Phone:
- 01502588857
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window