COMPASSION IN CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the only charity working the care sector who refuse to accept funding from either Government or Care Industry, this allows us to take a very different and effective approach which is evident in the ground-breaking work we do. We regularly publish comprehensive evidence from our helpline, which has exposed abuse, protected the vulnerable and supported whistle-blowers and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EILEEN CHUBB | Chair | 15 August 2003 |
|
|
||||
Karis Le-Winton | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ROFFEY | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HONOUR | Trustee | 15 August 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.10k | £29.47k | £12.71k | £8.57k | £9.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.99k | £33.58k | £21.75k | £23.93k | £18.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/08/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2004 as amended on 29 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF THE ELDERLY WHO HAVE SUFFERED ABUSE OR NEGLECT IN CARE SETTINGS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE WORKING IN THE CARE TO ENABLE THEM TO RECOGNISE AND REPORT ON ELDERLY ABUSE OR NEGLECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19A TRANSMERE ROAD
PETTS WOOD
ORPINGTON
BR5 1DT
- Phone:
- 01689875604
- Email:
- info@compassionincare.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window