Financial history THE HAFLINGER SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 1100783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.96k £26.64k £23.69k £22.51k £20.91k
Total expenditure £6.31k £21.23k £26.63k £22.24k £17.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A