HOLLINGDEAN DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust works, as lessee, to sustain the Community Centre and employs an Administrator. In partnership with 'The Trust for Developing Communities' it contributes funds for a Community Development Worker who supports the Trust in its aims to work with residents to attract funds for and manage community-projects and activities in the continued regeneration and improvement of Hollingdean, Brighton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 08 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE JENNIFER SIMPSON | Chair | 01 June 2003 |
|
|
||||
Julia Murray Logue | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Gunn Lane | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Blanche Suzanne Guerrier | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ethel Meredith | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Canham | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.55k | £49.45k | £40.77k | £44.71k | £52.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.38k | £45.10k | £38.61k | £62.56k | £49.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.75k | £8.00k | £22.72k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2004 AND 9 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT IN HOLLINGDEAN AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES ARE: A. TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE B. TO PROMOTE OR PROVIDE EDUCATION (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) C. TO PROVIDE OR PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE D. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICES AND CHILDCARE E. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY F. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN COMMUNITY CENTRES IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, AND G. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
HOLLINGDEAN AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLINGDEAN COMMUNITY CENTRE
THOMPSON ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN1 7BH
- Phone:
- 01273236160
- Email:
- hdtrustees@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
hollingdeancommunitycentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window