Financial history BROADOAK AND SMALLSHAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.86k £124.48k £82.27k £80.77k £105.23k
Total expenditure £82.36k £111.43k £88.64k £89.89k £102.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £88.00k £12.00k N/A £5.87k