Financial history FRIENDS OF TROWBRIDGE COMMUNITY SENSORY GARDEN

Charity Number: 1106281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.10k £7.68k £7.81k £8.50k £29.18k
Total expenditure £18.71k £9.15k £4.09k £5.92k £34.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A