HELP NORTH KOREAN CHILDREN
Charity number: 1101772
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- North Korea
Governance
Registration history:
- 27 January 2004: Standard registration
- 12 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN IN NORTH KOREA PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD CLOTHING AND MEDICINES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH KOREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window