JOHN POUNDS COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and provide facilities for social, recreational and creative leisure time opportunities for the people of Portsmouth, particularly in the area known as Portsea. To this end the charity runs the John Pounds Centre, providing sports and leisure facilities, an IT suite, revitalisation suite, art studio, cafe and creche and organising activities for local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£799,497
Donations and legacies | £507.65k | |
Charitable activities | £287.82k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £4.03k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£798,012
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £798.01k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £66,776 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £798.01k | |
Retained for future use | £1.49k |
People

11 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 27 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Pottinger | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Georgina Tregarthen | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Barrett | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Christopher North | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brett Lloyd Payne | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gina Elaine Perryman | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Danny Glavin | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEOFFREY MILLER | Trustee | 22 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES GOODSHIP | Trustee | 22 April 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £813.73k | £786.31k | £698.04k | £650.94k | £799.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £746.06k | £639.55k | £690.73k | £764.78k | £798.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.09k | £506.76k | £136.54k | £75.00k | £66.78k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £571.02k | £713.64k | £450.51k | £390.65k | £507.65k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £242.08k | £72.52k | £247.48k | £258.55k | £287.82k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £626 | £156 | £39 | £1.74k | £4.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £746.06k | £639.55k | £690.73k | £764.78k | £798.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.20k | £5.49k | £5.38k | £6.53k | £9.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £183.27k | £441.98k | £463.78k | £442.24k | £443.80k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £569.13k | £424.61k | £410.76k | £329.41k | £313.73k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £122.21k | £89.63k | £90.28k | £101.23k | £85.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG PERSONS OF 25 YEARS OR UNDER AND SECONDARY TO THAT (2) TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED (3) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF PORTSMOUTH, PARTICULARLY IN THE AREA KNOWN AS PORTSEA, IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA, THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL RECREATIONAL AND CREATIVE LEISURE TIME OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR LIFE (4) TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE JOHN POUNDS COMMUNITY FACILITY IN LIAISON WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY BODIES AND TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT IN SUCH MANAGEMENT
Area of benefit
CITY OF PORTSMOUNT WITH PARTICULAR REFERNCE TO PORTSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN POUNDS COMMUNITY TRUST
John Pounds Centre
23 Queen Street
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3HN
- Phone:
- 02392892010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window