Financial history NORTH PETHERTON BOWLING CLUB LIMITED

Charity Number: 1102177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £75.47k £41.68k £51.55k £52.88k £70.25k
Total expenditure £45.81k £34.36k £55.49k £57.70k £64.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.61k £27.95k N/A N/A N/A