Trustees NORTH PETHERTON BOWLING CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1102177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WALKER | Chair | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Dewey | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frank Davis | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JUNE MILTON | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE DONALD POPE | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GLENDINNING | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SWAYNE | Trustee | 01 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY PYNE | Trustee | 05 January 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.