Accounts and annual returns AL-HIDAYAH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1107617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2024 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2024 322 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 April 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 April 2022 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window