NSARDA KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRAINING STAFF AND DOGS TO BE CALLED OUT BY THE POLICE AND COMMUNITY TO HELP SEARCH FOR MISSING PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 08 January 2004: Standard registration
- CANTECH (Working name)
- SARDA - CANTECH (Working name)
- CANTECH VOLUNTEER SEARCH DOGS (Previous name)
- NATIONAL SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION - CANTECH (Previous name)
- SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION - CANTECH (Previous name)
- SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION NSARDA CANTECH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Langford | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Abrahamson | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Turnbull | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Desmond | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Abrahamson | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.64k | £11.05k | £4.22k | £5.00k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.92k | £4.44k | £10.79k | £6.86k | £8.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/2003 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2012
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEER SEARCH DOGS TO ASSIST ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN THE SEARCH AND RESCUE OF MISSING PERSONS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO GENERAL DOG WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liquid Computing Ltd
Maple Barn
Canterbury Road
Molash
CANTERBURY
CT4 8HF
- Phone:
- 01233800165
- Email:
- info@nsardakent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window