WLSINFO.ORG.UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a website. Provision of internet discussion forums. Provision of support groups around uk. Running two national meetings per year. Dissemination of information. Education of health care professionals. lobbying of health care commissioners and decision makers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 April 2004: Standard registration
- WLS INFO (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH CLARE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angela Janet Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220 | £161 | £160 | £23 | £422 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £2.97k | £2.98k | £3.71k | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN OBESITY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON THE VARIOUS TREATMENT METHODS AVAILABLE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE USE OF SURGERY FOR WEIGHT LOSS, THE PUBLICATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A WEBSITE MEETINGS AND CONFERENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WLSinfo
THE WOMENS ORGANISATION
ST. JAMES STREET
LIVERPOOL
L1 0AB
- Phone:
- 07984178160
- Email:
- ken.clare@wlsinfo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window