ZICHRON AHRON TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty amongst the elderly or persons in conditions of need, hardship and distress within the Jewish Community. The advancement of education according to the tenets of the Orthodox Jewish religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID TZVI SAURYMPER | Trustee | 03 June 2003 |
|
|||||
JOEL STEMPEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHANA SAURYMPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.35k | £83.81k | £87.37k | £67.10k | £44.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.24k | £172.69k | £33.89k | £114.85k | £142.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE ELDERLY OR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WITHIN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 19/20
BOURNE COURT
UNITY TRADING ESTATE
SOUTHEND ROAD
WOODFORD GREEN
- Phone:
- 02085517200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window