Financial history WELLS (ALL SAINTS) PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1100799
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £217.18k £259.87k £253.11k £270.34k £270.53k
Total expenditure £232.13k £219.37k £235.55k £269.19k £266.78k
Income from government contracts £85.90k £87.16k £131.84k £100.35k £115.51k
Income from government grants N/A £87.16k N/A N/A N/A