FRIENDS OF DR RADCLIFFE'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1100352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for Dr Radcliffe's School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £3,918
Total expenditure: £7,638

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Weston Trustee 20 October 2024
None on record
Rebecca Lewin Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Emily Portlock Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Bethany Oliver Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Denise Cadd Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Katie Bradley Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.13k £5.09k £2.92k £4.78k £3.92k
Total expenditure £4.90k £5.95k £4.45k £4.14k £7.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 July 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dr Radcliffes C of E Primary School
Fir Lane
Steeple Aston
BICESTER
OX25 4SF
Phone:
01869 346876
Website:

No information available