WELLSPRING THERAPY & TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WELLSPRING IS A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING AND TRAINING CENTRE, AIMING TO PROVIDE AFFORDABLE PSYCHOLOGICAL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE IN DISTRESS AND PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH.OUR SERVICES ARE AVAILABLE TO ADULTS, YOUNG PEOPLE, FAMILIES IN NEED AND TO ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS, BUSINESSES AND CHURCHES AND INCLUDES: COUNSELLING, TRAINING, SUPERVISION, YOUNG PEOPLE?S PROJECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WOOD | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ratcliffe | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bull | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Phil Carman | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Bogle | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HALL | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McKee | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Castro | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.17k | £271.59k | £341.19k | £377.61k | £404.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.19k | £263.62k | £274.94k | £376.89k | £453.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.42k | £15.00k | N/A | £12.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2003 as amended on 21 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTRESS IN INDIVIDUALS BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE IN HARROGATE NORTH YORKSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE COMPANY (HEREIN CALLED "THE DIRECTORS") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING COURSES FOR THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING COURSES FOR THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
HARROGATE NORTH YORKSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 HIGH STREET
HARROGATE
HG2 7LW
- Phone:
- 01423881881
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window